TX HB3531 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Returned from the House for further action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Returned from the House for further action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to motor vehicle titles, registration, and license plates.
Title
Relating to motor vehicle titles, registration, and license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | Returned from the House for further action |
2021-05-27 | House | Returned to the Senate for further action |
2021-05-27 | House | Point of order sustained Rule 11, Section 2, and Rule 8, Section 1(a), (c), and (d); Article III, Section 35(b) |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Schwertner |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1090 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-14 | House | Amended 1-Geren |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AUCTIONS & AUCTIONEERS
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
SALVAGE YARDS & SALVAGE DEALERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
SALVAGE YARDS & SALVAGE DEALERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration