TX HB3524 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Summary
Relating to the use of recycled glass in aggregate used by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Title
Relating to the use of recycled glass in aggregate used by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
Rep. William Callegari [R] | Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] | Sen. Roland Gutierrez [D] | Rep. Linda Harper-Brown [R] |
Rep. Susan King [R] | Rep. Tracy King [D] | Rep. Diana Maldonado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-23 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |