TX HB3502 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to organization of, meetings of, and voting by condominium unit owners' associations and property owners' associations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to organization of, meetings of, and voting by condominium unit owners' associations and property owners' associations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#679 (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#679
2021-05-04HousePassed
2021-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1939 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback