TX HB3469 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disposition of certain property by the former Bois D'Arc Island Levee Improvement District of Dallas and Kaufman Counties and the record of dissolution of that district.
Title
Relating to the disposition of certain property by the former Bois D'Arc Island Levee Improvement District of Dallas and Kaufman Counties and the record of dissolution of that district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#791 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#791 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | See remarks for effective date | |
2023-06-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#791 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2023-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BOIS D'ARC ISLAND LEVEE IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
DALLAS COUNTY
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
KAUFMAN COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
DALLAS COUNTY
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
KAUFMAN COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility