TX HB3459 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to preauthorization requirements for certain health care services and utilization review for certain health benefit plans.
Title
Relating to preauthorization requirements for certain health care services and utilization review for certain health benefit plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1595 (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#873 (Y: 127 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#873 (Y: 127 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-18 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction HCR 112 |
2021-05-29 | House | House adopts resolution for tech. correction HCR 112 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1595 |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Huffman |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#873 |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1883 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1883 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1883 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Health Care Providers
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
PHYSICIANS
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
PHYSICIANS