TX HB3458 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - No action taken in committee
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to the requirements for a petition proposing an amendment to the charter of a home-rule municipality.
Title
Relating to the requirements for a petition proposing an amendment to the charter of a home-rule municipality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB690 (Same As) 2009-03-18 - Left pending in committee