TX HB3428 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the compensation of criminal law magistrates appointed for certain district courts and criminal county courts at law in Tarrant County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the compensation of criminal law magistrates appointed for certain district courts and criminal county courts at law in Tarrant County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-05-04SenateRead first time
2021-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-23HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23HouseRecord vote RV#417
2021-04-23HousePassed
2021-04-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-23HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-13HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-06HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-30HousePosting rule suspended
2021-03-22HouseReferred to County Affairs
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback