TX HB3391 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of a specialty court for certain public safety employees who commit a criminal offense; imposing fees for participation and testing, counseling, and treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of a specialty court for certain public safety employees who commit a criminal offense; imposing fees for participation and testing, counseling, and treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1219 (Y: 128 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Point of order overruled RV#1189 (Y: 132 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-22HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-22SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-15SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-15SenateRead first time
2017-05-15SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-12HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-12HouseRecord vote
2017-05-12HousePassed
2017-05-12HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseRecord vote
2017-05-11HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-11HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-04HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-04-04HouseRead first time
2017-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback