TX HB3325 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the terminology used to describe transportation-related accidents.
Title
Relating to the terminology used to describe transportation-related accidents.
Sponsors
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#417 |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-31 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1945 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
ACCIDENTS
AIRPORTS
Insurance
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Aviation
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
WATER
Water--Navigation & Ports
AIRPORTS
Insurance
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Aviation
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
WATER
Water--Navigation & Ports