TX HB3299 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain land use regulations for land annexed by a municipality for limited purposes.
Title
Relating to certain land use regulations for land annexed by a municipality for limited purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-04-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed |