TX HB3287 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the sale of ale and beer by certain brewers and manufacturers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the sale of ale and beer by certain brewers and manufacturers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1786 (Y: 115 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1018 (Y: 111 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Record vote RV#997 (Y: 110 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#996 (Y: 14 N: 122 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2017-05-06 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#995 (Y: 15 N: 121 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2017-05-06 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#994 (Y: 41 N: 92 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts resolution for tech. correction
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts resolution for tech. correction
2017-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateAmended
2017-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-08SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-08HouseRecord vote
2017-05-08HousePassed
2017-05-08HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-06HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-06HouseAmended
2017-05-06HouseAmended
2017-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-28HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2017-03-28HouseRead first time
2017-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3287
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03287I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03287H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03287E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03287S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03287F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3287&RcdVtNo=994&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3287&RcdVtNo=995&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3287&RcdVtNo=996&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3287&RcdVtNo=997&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3287&RcdVtNo=1018&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3287&RcdVtNo=1786&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=40
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=39

Bill Comments

feedback