TX HB3285 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eligibility to serve as an interpreter in an election.
Title
Relating to eligibility to serve as an interpreter in an election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB331 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately