TX SB331 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to eligibility to serve as an interpreter in an election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to eligibility to serve as an interpreter in an election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1441 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective immediately
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-28HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28SenateRecord vote
2021-05-28SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-28SenateRead
2021-05-28SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1441
2021-05-25HousePassed
2021-05-25HouseAmendment withdrawn 2-Crockett
2021-05-25HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Wu
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Elections
2021-04-12HouseRead first time
2021-04-08HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-07SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-07SenateRecord vote
2021-04-07SenatePassed
2021-04-07SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-07SenateRecord vote
2021-04-07SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-07SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-07SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-29SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-29SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-09SenateRead first time
2021-01-13SenateFiled
2021-01-13SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3285 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn from schedule

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB331
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00331I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00331S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00331E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00331H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00331F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00331H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00331H32.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00331I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00331I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00331E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00331H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00331H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00331F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-07-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB331&RcdVtNo=1441&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=118

Bill Comments

feedback