TX HB3240 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study by the Legislative Budget Board concerning the long-term effects of regulating tuition rates and amounts charged by public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to a study by the Legislative Budget Board concerning the long-term effects of regulating tuition rates and amounts charged by public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Meza [D] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Interim Studies
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Interim Studies
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD