TX HB3233 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment by certain counties and hospital districts of disease control pilot programs to reduce the risk of certain infectious and communicable diseases; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to the establishment by certain counties and hospital districts of disease control pilot programs to reduce the risk of certain infectious and communicable diseases; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] |
Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#486 (Y: 81 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#486 |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-27 | House | Amended 1-Minjarez |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2130 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
BEXAR COUNTY
DALLAS COUNTY
EL PASO COUNTY
HARRIS COUNTY
Health
Health--AIDS
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
NEEDLES & SYRINGES
NUECES COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
TRAVIS COUNTY
WEBB COUNTY
DALLAS COUNTY
EL PASO COUNTY
HARRIS COUNTY
Health
Health--AIDS
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
NEEDLES & SYRINGES
NUECES COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
TRAVIS COUNTY
WEBB COUNTY