TX SB2130 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment by certain counties and hospital districts of disease control pilot programs to reduce the risk of certain infectious and communicable diseases; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment by certain counties and hospital districts of disease control pilot programs to reduce the risk of certain infectious and communicable diseases; authorizing fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-04-01SenateRead first time
2021-03-12SenateFiled
2021-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3233 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Received from the House
HB4342 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Referred to County Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback