TX HB3197 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in certain municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in certain municipalities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2019-05-10HouseWithdrawn from calendar (by author)
2019-05-10HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-03HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2019-05-03HouseWithdrawn from calendar (by author)
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-28HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-23HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-03-13HouseRead first time
2019-03-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback