TX HB3197 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in certain municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2019-05-10 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2019-05-03 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
City Government
City Government--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
City Government
City Government--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3197 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03197I.htm |