TX HB3195 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a requirement that each public institution of higher education develop and implement a strategic plan for the prevention of sexual assault and unplanned pregnancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a requirement that each public institution of higher education develop and implement a strategic plan for the prevention of sexual assault and unplanned pregnancy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-17HousePosting rule suspended
2017-03-30HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-30HouseRead first time
2017-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback