TX HB3195 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a requirement that each public institution of higher education develop and implement a strategic plan for the prevention of sexual assault and unplanned pregnancy.
Title
Relating to a requirement that each public institution of higher education develop and implement a strategic plan for the prevention of sexual assault and unplanned pregnancy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-17 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3195 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03195I.htm |