TX HB3157 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to taxes and fees wholly or partly deposited to the credit of the state highway fund; increasing the rates of the gasoline and diesel fuel taxes, authorizing the increase or decrease of those rates in subsequent years, and increasing motor vehicle registration fees.
Title
Relating to taxes and fees wholly or partly deposited to the credit of the state highway fund; increasing the rates of the gasoline and diesel fuel taxes, authorizing the increase or decrease of those rates in subsequent years, and increasing motor vehicle registration fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR136 (Enabling for) 2013-04-10 - Left pending in subcommittee
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Highways
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Highways
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB3157 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB03157I.htm |