TX HB3133 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of personal leave during school holidays by school district employees.
Title
Relating to the use of personal leave during school holidays by school district employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Holidays
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Holidays
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3133 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03133I.htm |