TX HB3106 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the censorship of users' expressions by an interactive computer service.
Title
Relating to the censorship of users' expressions by an interactive computer service.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB12 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Postponed 5/25/21 11:30 PM
HB2587 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Left pending in committee
SB12 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Postponed 5/25/21 11:30 PM
HB2587 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Left pending in committee
SB12 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Postponed 5/25/21 11:30 PM
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Business & Commerce--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3106 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03106I.htm |