TX SB12 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Postponed 5/25/21 11:30 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Postponed 5/25/21 11:30 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to complaint procedures and disclosure requirements for social media platforms and to the censorship of users' expressions by an interactive computer service.
Title
Relating to complaint procedures and disclosure requirements for social media platforms and to the censorship of users' expressions by an interactive computer service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 10 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 10 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Postponed 5/25/21 11:30 PM |
2021-05-25 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2021-05-25 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-25 | House | Postponed 5/25/21 7:40 PM |
2021-05-25 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-24 | House | Postponed 5/25/21 10:00 AM |
2021-05-24 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-24 | House | Postponed 5/24/21 8:00 PM |
2021-05-24 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended 1-Sanford |
2021-05-24 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-24 | House | Postponed 5/24/21 5:15 PM |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-24 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-06 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Gutierrez |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Blanco |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2587 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Left pending in committee
HB3106 (Same As) 2021-03-19 - Referred to State Affairs
HB3106 (Same As) 2021-03-19 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET