TX HB3088 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to exemptions for certain residential property owners from the applicability of certain regulations of residential mortgage loan companies and residential mortgage loan originators.
Title
Relating to exemptions for certain residential property owners from the applicability of certain regulations of residential mortgage loan companies and residential mortgage loan originators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Investments & Financial Services |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Financial
Financial--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Financial--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens