TX HB3063 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transfer of a retired law enforcement animal.
Title
Relating to the transfer of a retired law enforcement animal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-04-30 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 2100 |
2019-04-25 | House | Postponed 4/30/19 9:00 AM |
2019-04-25 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-16 | House | Postponed 4/25/19 9:00 AM |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-03-21 | House | Correction in referral |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2100 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - Effective immediately
HJR96 (Enabling for) 2019-04-25 - Laid on the table subject to call
HJR96 (Enabling for) 2019-04-25 - Laid on the table subject to call