TX HJR96 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to allow the transfer of a law enforcement animal to a qualified caretaker in certain circumstances.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to allow the transfer of a law enforcement animal to a qualified caretaker in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-04-25 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SJR 32 |
2019-04-16 | House | Postponed 4/25/19 9:00 AM |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB3063 (Enabled by) 2019-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
SJR32 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Filed with the Secretary of State
SJR32 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Subjects
Animals
County Government
County Government--General
Law Enforcement
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
County Government
County Government--General
Law Enforcement
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments