TX HB3059 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Postponed 12/25/19 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Postponed 12/25/19 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirement that motor vehicle dealers apply for the registration of and title for certain vehicles sold by the dealer.
Title
Relating to the requirement that motor vehicle dealers apply for the registration of and title for certain vehicles sold by the dealer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Postponed 12/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1910 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Transportation