TX HB3002 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a merchant allowing a person suspected of committing or attempting to commit theft to complete a theft education program.
Title
Relating to a merchant allowing a person suspected of committing or attempting to commit theft to complete a theft education program.
Sponsors
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R] | Rep. Nicole Collier [D] | Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R] | Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D] |
Rep. Chris Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#582 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Property
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Property
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General