TX HB2938 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Sienna Plantation Levee Improvement District of Fort Bend County, Texas.
Title
Relating to the Sienna Plantation Levee Improvement District of Fort Bend County, Texas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1858 (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-15 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2017-04-10 | House | Correction in referral |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
FORT BEND COUNTY
SIENNA PLANTATION LEVEE IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER
Water--Rights
FORT BEND COUNTY
SIENNA PLANTATION LEVEE IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER
Water--Rights