TX HB2926 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to legislative review and approval of state agency rules.
Title
Relating to legislative review and approval of state agency rules.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Roberts [R] | Rep. Gary Elkins [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] |
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR94 (Enabling for) 2017-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Legislature
SECRETARY OF STATE
STATE AGENCIES' RULES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
SECRETARY OF STATE
STATE AGENCIES' RULES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure