TX HB2911 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-26 - House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-26 - House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to voter registration.
Title
Relating to voter registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1997 (Y: 139 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - FA3 Bettencourt (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - FA2 Hughes (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - FA3 Bettencourt (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - FA2 Hughes (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1997 |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | House | House requests conference committee |
2019-05-23 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2019-05-23 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Bettencourt |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Hughes |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Postponed 5/19/19 6:00 PM |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Elections |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |