TX HB2911 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a reemployment program as a condition of community supervision for certain veterans who commit a misdemeanor offense.
Title
Relating to a reemployment program as a condition of community supervision for certain veterans who commit a misdemeanor offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-27 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--General
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Military & Veterans
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Courts--General
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Military & Veterans
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS