TX HB287 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House International Relations & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House International Relations & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to unlawful employment practices regarding discrimination in payment of compensation.
Title
Relating to unlawful employment practices regarding discrimination in payment of compensation.
Sponsors
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Nicole Collier [D] |
Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Rep. Victoria Neave Criado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB112 (Similar To) 2019-02-01 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB287 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00287I.htm |