TX HB2846 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to discrimination against or burdening certain constitutional rights of an applicant for or holder of a license to practice law in this state.
Title
Relating to discrimination against or burdening certain constitutional rights of an applicant for or holder of a license to practice law in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB559 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
SB559 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
SB559 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Courts
Courts--General
Lawyers
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
Courts--General
Lawyers
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STATE BAR OF TEXAS