TX HB2841 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of average enrollment for purposes of the public school finance system.
Title
Relating to the use of average enrollment for purposes of the public school finance system.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Rogers [R] | Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Mihaela Plesa [D] |
Rep. Stephen Allison [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB263 (Same As) 2023-03-14 - Co-author authorized
HB31 (Same As) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Public Education
HB1376 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Public Education
SB263 (Same As) 2023-03-14 - Co-author authorized
SB2301 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to Education
HB31 (Same As) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Public Education
HB1376 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Public Education
SB263 (Same As) 2023-03-14 - Co-author authorized
SB2301 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB2841 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02841I.htm |