TX HB2815 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to requirements regarding information to be provided to employees covered by workers' compensation health care networks.
Title
Relating to requirements regarding information to be provided to employees covered by workers' compensation health care networks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-02 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-01 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-01 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-08 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-04-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-04-06 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-04-06 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed |