TX HB2786 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to employee turnover reporting during a day-care center's, group day-care home's, or registered family home's license or registration renewal.
Title
Relating to employee turnover reporting during a day-care center's, group day-care home's, or registered family home's license or registration renewal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1231 (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1231 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Day Care
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions