TX HB275 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to making an appropriation of money from the economic stabilization fund for expenditure during the current state fiscal biennium.
Title
Relating to making an appropriation of money from the economic stabilization fund for expenditure during the current state fiscal biennium.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Comptroller | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const. | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-26 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-25 | Ordered not printed | |
2011-05-25 | Printing rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution | |
2011-05-25 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-24 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-23 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-23 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-20 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-20 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-20 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-19 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-19 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Motion fails | |
2011-05-19 | Motion to instruct conferees | |
2011-05-19 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-16 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-16 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-16 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-16 | Record vote | |
2011-05-16 | Passed | |
2011-05-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-16 | Record vote | |
2011-05-16 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-16 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-16 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-16 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-16 | Record vote | |
2011-05-16 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-16 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-16 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-16 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-13 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-09 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Finance | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time | |
2011-04-04 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-01 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-01 | Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution | |
2011-04-01 | Record vote | |
2011-04-01 | Passed | |
2011-04-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment as amended tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment amended | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment as amended tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment amended | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-03-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment amended | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment as amended tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment amended | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-03-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-30 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-30 | Record vote | |
2011-03-30 | Rules suspended | |
2011-03-23 | Record vote | |
2011-03-23 | Calendars Committee rule adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2011-03-23 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-23 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-23 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-15 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-15 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-10 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-09 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-28 | Filed |