TX HB2740 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the election of the board of directors of the Panola County Groundwater Conservation District.
Title
Relating to the election of the board of directors of the Panola County Groundwater Conservation District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-19 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-04 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-28 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PANOLA COUNTY GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility