TX HB2669 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to remedies in certain taxpayer suits against the state.
Title
Relating to remedies in certain taxpayer suits against the state.
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Shine [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#577 (Y: 19 N: 120 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | House | Failed to pass to engrossment |
2017-05-01 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-01 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-04-20 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-01 | House | Filed |