TX HB2667 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the licensing and regulation of certain occupations and activities; providing administrative penalties; requiring occupational licenses; authorizing fees; creating criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to the licensing and regulation of certain occupations and activities; providing administrative penalties; requiring occupational licenses; authorizing fees; creating criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Amended RV#1218 (Y: 124 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1218 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-09 | House | Amended 1-Klick |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended 3-Howard |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended 2-Hernandez |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended 1-Guillen |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Alcoholism & Drug Abuse
BARBERS
COSMETOLOGISTS
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MASSAGE THERAPY & MASSAGE THERAPISTS
MIDWIVES & MIDWIFERY
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
MOLD & MOLD REMEDIATION
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
ORTHOTICS & ORTHOTISTS
PROSTHETISTS & PROSTHETICS
BARBERS
COSMETOLOGISTS
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MASSAGE THERAPY & MASSAGE THERAPISTS
MIDWIVES & MIDWIFERY
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
MOLD & MOLD REMEDIATION
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
ORTHOTICS & ORTHOTISTS
PROSTHETISTS & PROSTHETICS