TX HB2662 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to voter approval of the issuance of certain obligations by municipalities to pay their unfunded liabilities to a public pension fund.
Title
Relating to voter approval of the issuance of certain obligations by municipalities to pay their unfunded liabilities to a public pension fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB957 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Municipal
City Government--Finance
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2662 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02662I.htm |