TX HB2650 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a procedure for imposing intermediate sanctions on a person who violates certain conditions of community supervision.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a procedure for imposing intermediate sanctions on a person who violates certain conditions of community supervision.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-10 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-10 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-04 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Corrections | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION