TX HB2632 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to removing a criminal penalty and authorizing a civil penalty for truancy.
Title
Relating to removing a criminal penalty and authorizing a civil penalty for truancy.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Dan Huberty [R] |
Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-11 - House - HB 2632Third Reading House (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-08 | House | Amended |
2015-05-08 | House | Amended |
2015-05-08 | House | Amended |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-10 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2015-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
TRUANCY
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
TRUANCY