TX HB2629 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to unauthorized persons at public or private institutions of higher education in this state and to trespass, damage, or defacement occurring on the grounds of those institutions; amending provisions subject to a criminal penalty and creating offenses.
Title
Relating to unauthorized persons at public or private institutions of higher education in this state and to trespass, damage, or defacement occurring on the grounds of those institutions; amending provisions subject to a criminal penalty and creating offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] | Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Charlie Geren [R] | Rep. Sarah Davis [R] |
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - HB 2629Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Private Schools
TRESPASS
Criminal Procedure--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Private Schools
TRESPASS