TX HB2622 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 63-9)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the enforcement of certain federal laws regulating firearms, firearm accessories, and firearm ammunition within the State of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the enforcement of certain federal laws regulating firearms, firearm accessories, and firearm ammunition within the State of Texas.

Sponsors

Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]
Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]
Rep. Jeff Cason [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. David Cook [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]
Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]
Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Eddie Morales [D]
Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Tan Parker [R]
Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]
Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]Rep. Shelby Slawson [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]
Rep. David Spiller [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Cody Vasut [R]
Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]

Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#587 (Y: 83 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#563 (Y: 89 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#562 (Y: 44 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#561 (Y: 63 N: 82 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-26HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#587
2021-04-30HousePassed
2021-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#563
2021-04-29HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#562
2021-04-29HouseAmendment fails of adoption 3-Slaton
2021-04-29HouseAmendment withdrawn 2-Slaton
2021-04-29HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-04-29HouseAmendment(s) offered 2-Slaton
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#561
2021-04-29HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-J. Turner
2021-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-29HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB541 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Referred to State Affairs
SB513 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Referred to State Affairs
SB513 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2622
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02622I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02622H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02622E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02622S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02622F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02622H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02622H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02622H23.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02622I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02622H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02622H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02622E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02622E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2622&RcdVtNo=561&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2622&RcdVtNo=562&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2622&RcdVtNo=563&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2622&RcdVtNo=587&Ch=H&Dt=04/30/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=50
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=43

Bill Comments

feedback