TX HB2603 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the distribution of universal service funds to certain small and rural local exchange companies.
Title
Relating to the distribution of universal service funds to certain small and rural local exchange companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | See remarks for effective date | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-24 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-21 | Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-21 | Record vote | |
2011-05-21 | Passed | |
2011-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-21 | Record vote | |
2011-05-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-06-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-18 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-18 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-05-16 | Read first time | |
2011-05-16 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-13 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-12 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-12 | Amended | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-20 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-03-15 | Read first time | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |