TX HB2582 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to required notice of the cost and health benefit plan coverage of newborn screening tests.
Title
Relating to required notice of the cost and health benefit plan coverage of newborn screening tests.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Companion considered in lieu of in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB747 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
INTERNET
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
INTERNET
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2582 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02582I.htm |