TX SB747 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of the newborn screening program.
Title
Relating to the administration of the newborn screening program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1370 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1370 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1370 |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-13 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-13 | House | Amended 1-Lucio |
2019-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2582 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Subjects
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
INTERNET
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
INTERNET
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF